EP0248521 - Electrical contactors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1990 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saunders, David Christopher 1 Roberts Close Wroughton Swindon Wiltshire SN4 0RS / GB | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Nicholson, Ronald, et al Intellectual Property Department The Plessey Company plc 2-60 Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | Nicholson, Ronald, et al Intellectual Property Department The Plessey Company plc 2-60 Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87303609.9 | 24.04.1987 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | GB19860010117 | 25.04.1986 Original published format: GB 8610117 | [1987/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0248521 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0248521 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/073, H01R23/72 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
H01R12/714 (EP);
G01R1/07314 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/50] | G01R1/073 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1987/50] | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbinder | [1987/50] | English: | Electrical contactors | [1987/50] | French: | Connecteurs électriques | [1987/50] | File destroyed: | 27.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/24] | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.11.1989 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4574236 ; | [Y]GB2125236 ; | [A]DE1910314 ; | [A]US4571542 ; | [A]US4344662 ; | [A]WO8600173 |