EP0247740 - Novel isocarbacyclins and processes for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hazato, Atsuo 3-18-4, Tamadaira Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Toshio 6-17-20, Tamadaira Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Okamura, Noriaki 1-31-1, Sengawa-cho Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Bannai, Kiyoahi 3-18-4-224, Tamadaira Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Kurozumi, Seizi 1-2-28 Higashitokura Kokubunji-shi Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Suzuki, Masaaki 2-66, Yata-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 07 /
Noyori, Ryoji 135-417, Umemorishinden Nisshin-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken / JP | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1987/49] | Application number, filing date | 87303883.0 | 30.04.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | JP19860099470 | 01.05.1986 Original published format: JP 9947086 | JP19860219117 | 19.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21911786 | JP19860219118 | 19.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21911886 | JP19860219119 | 19.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21911986 | [1987/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0247740 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0247740 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247740 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C405/00, A61K31/557 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
C07C405/0025 (EP,US);
C07C405/00 (KR);
C07C405/0083 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/49] | C07C177/00, A61K31/557 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/49] | Title | German: | Isocarbacycline und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1987/49] | English: | Novel isocarbacyclins and processes for production thereof | [1987/49] | French: | Isocarbacyclines et leurs procédés de production | [1987/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 13.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - Tetrahedron Letters, Vol. 25, No. 44, 1984, pages 5087-5090; Pergamon Press Ltd, GB, T. MASE et al.: "An efficient synthesis of isocarbacyclin starting from furfural", whole article. | [A] - Tetrahedron Letters, No. 36, 1972, pages 3815-3817; Pergamon Press Ltd, GB, J. BAGLI et al.: "Prostaglandins V7-utility of the Nef reaction in the synthesis of prostanoic acids. A total synthesis of (+/-)-11-deoxy-PGE2, and their C-15 epimers", Compound 3. | [A] - Tetrahedron Letters, Vol. 27, No. 7, 1986, pages 845-846; Pergamon Press Ltd, GB, D. FERROUD et al.: "Bis (arylsulfonyl)methane: A versatile synthon in pheromone synthesis", whole article. | Examination | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vo. 27, no.7, 1986, pages 845-846; PERGAMON Press LTD; GB D. FERROUD et al.: "Bis (arylsulfonyl)methane: A versatile synthon in pheromene synthesis." |