EP0250078 - Programmable low impedance interconnect circuit element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/52] | Programmable low impedance interconnect circuit element and method of forming thereof | ||
[1992/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACTEL CORPORATION 320 Soquel Way Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | For all designated states ACTEL CORPORATION 320 Soquel Way Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohsen, Amr M. 4076 Sobey Court Saratoga California 95070 / US | 02 /
McCollum, John L. 19810 Merribrook Drive Saratoga California 95070 / US | 03 /
Hamdy, Esmat Z. 4486 Ariel Fremont California 94536 / US | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | Williams, Trevor John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | [1987/52] | Application number, filing date | 87303971.3 | 01.05.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | US19860861519 | 09.05.1986 Original published format: US 861519 | [1987/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0250078 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0250078 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0250078 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/52 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
H01L23/5252 (EP,US);
H10B20/00 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | Programmierbares Verbindungselement niedriger Impedanz | [1992/37] | English: | Programmable low impedance interconnect circuit element | [1992/37] | French: | Elément d'interconnexion programmable à basse impédance | [1992/37] |
Former [1987/52] | Programmierbares Verbindungselement niedriger Impedanz und Verfahren zum Herstellen desselben | ||
Former [1987/52] | Programmable low impedance interconnect circuit element and method of forming thereof | ||
Former [1987/52] | Elément d'interconnexion programmable à basse impédance et son procédé de formation | Examination procedure | 02.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 30.05.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.07.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1991 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.1992 | BE | 09.09.1992 | CH | 09.09.1992 | GR | 09.09.1992 | LI | 09.09.1992 | NL | 09.09.1992 | SE | 09.09.1992 | ES | 20.12.1992 | LU | 31.05.1993 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 09.09.1992 | |
BE | 09.09.1992 | ||
CH | 09.09.1992 | ||
GR | 09.09.1992 | ||
LI | 09.09.1992 | ||
NL | 09.09.1992 | ||
SE | 09.09.1992 | ||
LU | 31.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 09.09.1992 | |
BE | 09.09.1992 | ||
CH | 09.09.1992 | ||
LI | 09.09.1992 | ||
NL | 09.09.1992 | ||
SE | 09.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | BE | 09.09.1992 | |
CH | 09.09.1992 | ||
LI | 09.09.1992 | ||
NL | 09.09.1992 | ||
SE | 09.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | CH | 09.09.1992 | |
LI | 09.09.1992 | ||
NL | 09.09.1992 | ||
SE | 09.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | CH | 09.09.1992 | |
LI | 09.09.1992 | ||
NL | 09.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | CH | 09.09.1992 | |
LI | 09.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57118668 ; | [A]US3576549 (HESS MARTIN S, et al); | [A]US3787822 (RIOULT J); | [YD]US4507757 (MCELROY DAVID J [US]); | [YD]US4543594 (MOHSEN AMR M [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 215 (E-138)[1093], 28th October 1982; & JP-A-57 118 668 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 23-07-1982, & JP57118668 A 00000000 |