|
07.11.1996 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
19.08.1996 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.06.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.06.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.1996 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1996 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1996 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1996 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.12.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.1995 |
Oral proceedings: Annex to summons |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.11.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1994 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1994 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1994 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
22.08.1994 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1994 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.1994 |
Application deemed withdrawn |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.1994 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.1994 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.1994 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.1994 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
25 |
|
25.05.1994 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1994 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.03.1994 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.03.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.03.1994 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1994 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1994 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1994 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.02.1994 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.02.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.02.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.12.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.12.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.12.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
24.12.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.12.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.12.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1993 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.1992 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.11.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1992 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.1992 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1992 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.1992 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.07.1992 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.05.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1991 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.1991 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.09.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.11.1990 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1990 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1990 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.1990 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.1990 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.1990 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1990 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.09.1989 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1989 |
Information concerning the posting of documents in due time |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.1988 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.1988 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1987 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1987 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.1987 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.1987 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1987 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1987 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.06.1987 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
21 |