EP0254416 - Electrical coils [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1988/04] | For all designated states The National Research Development Corporation 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mansfield, Peter 15 Devonshire Avenue Beeston Nottingham / GB | 02 /
Chapman, Barry Leonard Walter 132 Trent Road Beeston Nottingham / GB | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305443.1 | 19.06.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | GB19860015674 | 26.06.1986 Original published format: GB 8615674 | [1988/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0254416 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0254416 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/20, G01R33/34, G01R33/38, H01F41/04 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
G01R33/381 (EP,US);
G01R33/421 (EP,US);
H01F7/20 (EP,US);
G01R33/3815 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/04] | H01F7/20, G01N24/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1988/04] | Title | German: | Elektrische Wicklungen | [1988/04] | English: | Electrical coils | [1988/04] | French: | Enroulements électriques | [1988/04] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 25.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1285694 (PERKIN ELMER LTD); | [A]EP0086560 (TECHNICARE CORP [US]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE, vol. 66, no. 3, 15th February 1986, pages 573-576, editor: W.S. Brey, Jr., Academic Press, Inc., San Diego, US; P. MANSFIELD et al.: "Active magnetic screening of gradient coils in NMR imaging" |