EP0252740 - Photosensitizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLARCHEM RESEARCH, A DIVISION OF BROLOR INVESTMENTS LIMITED 516 Gordon Baker Road Willowdale Ontario M2H 3B4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states SOLARCHEM RESEARCH, A DIVISION OF BROLOR INVESTMENTS LIMITED 516 Gordon Baker Road Willowdale Ontario M2H 3B4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarke E. Slemon 77 Finch Avenue East No 266 Willowdale Ontario M2N 6H8 / CA | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Orr, William McLean, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Orr, William McLean, et al URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire, LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87306081.8 | 09.07.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | CA19860513436 | 09.07.1986 Original published format: CA 513436 | [1988/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0252740 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C172/00, B01J31/06, C08F2/50, C08F8/00 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
C07C401/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/02] | Title | German: | Photosensibilisatoren | [1988/02] | English: | Photosensitizer | [1988/02] | French: | Photosensibilisateurs | [1988/02] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 07.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 02.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/49] | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2058793 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND); | [A]EP0130509 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]US4609444 (GUILLET JAMES E [CA]) | [A] - "RECUEIL DES TRAVAUX CHIMIQUES DES PAYS-BAS", JOURNAL OF THE ROYAL NETHERLANDS CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 89, no. 3, March 1970, pages 261-264, Amsterdam, NL; A.E.C. SNOEREN et al.: "Studies on vitamin D and related compounds. Part 21 - photosensitized reactions" |