blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0300103

EP0300103 - Wax crystal modification using dewaxing aids under agitated conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.09.1992
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.10.1992 [1992/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY
P.O.Box 390
180 Park Avenue
Florham Park
New Jersey 07932-0390 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/04]For all designated states
EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY
P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue
Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US
Inventor(s)01 / West, Theodore Harvey
2047 Blackwell Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 7H4 / CA
[1989/04]
Representative(s)Somers, Harold Arnold, et al
ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd.
Patents & Licences
Mailpoint 12
Esso House, Ermyn Way
Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/04]Somers, Harold Arnold, et al
ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way
Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB
Application number, filing date87306510.623.07.1987
[1989/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0300103
Date:25.01.1989
Language:EN
[1989/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0300103
Date:06.11.1991
Language:EN
[1991/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.1988
ClassificationIPC:C10G73/32
[1989/04]
CPC:
C10G73/04 (EP); C10G73/32 (EP)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [1989/04]
TitleGerman:Wachskristallveränderung durch die Verwendung von entwachsenden Hilfsmitteln unter besonderen Rührverhältnissen[1989/04]
English:Wax crystal modification using dewaxing aids under agitated conditions[1989/04]
French:Modification des cristaux de cire en utilisant des auxiliaires de déparaffinage sous certaines conditions d'agitation[1989/04]
Examination procedure17.07.1989Examination requested  [1989/37]
09.04.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.04.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.1991Fee for grant paid
03.06.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[E]US4695363  ;
 [E]EP0247762  ;
 [Y]EP0107917  ;
 [Y]US3393144  ;
 [Y]US2036966  ;
 [A]GB2152527  ;
 [A]US2903411  ;
 [A]US1871172  ;
 [A]EP0013150  ;
 [A]US1892283  (MANLEY ROBERT E);
 [A]USRE19869E  ;
 [A]US1867580
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.