|
13.11.2001 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.05.2001 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
42 |
|
04.05.2001 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2001 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2000 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
15.12.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.01.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.09.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.09.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.08.1997 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1997 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.02.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.11.1996 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.08.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1996 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.1996 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.1996 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.1996 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.1996 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.03.1996 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
30.10.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.10.1995 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1995 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.01.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.12.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.12.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.12.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
01.12.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
01.12.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.1994 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.1993 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.1993 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1993 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.1993 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.1993 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.02.1993 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
23.10.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.08.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.08.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.04.1992 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.1988 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |