|
18.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1999 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1999 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1998 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.1997 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.09.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
03.04.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.1995 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.02.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1994 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.10.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1994 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.10.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1994 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.1994 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.09.1994 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1994 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.08.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.05.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.03.1994 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.03.1994 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.01.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1993 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.08.1992 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
23.12.1991 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.1989 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.1988 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1987 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1987 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
16.09.1987 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |