EP0302976 - A method of making alumina and MgO preheatable insulating refractory liners and methods of use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSOLIDATED CERAMIC PRODUCTS, INC. 833 Cherry Street Blanchester Ohio 45107 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states CONSOLIDATED CERAMIC PRODUCTS, INC. 833 Cherry Street Blanchester Ohio 45107 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Howard B. 8714 Tanagerwoods Drive Cincinnati Ohio 45249 / US | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London, WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87307173.2 | 13.08.1987 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302976 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/00, C04B38/00, C04B35/04 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
C04B38/00 (EP);
B22D41/02 (EP);
C04B14/30 (EP);
C04B30/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung vorheizbarer, isolierender, feuerfester Auskleidungen aus Aluminiumoxid und Mg0 und Verfahren zu deren Verwendung | [1989/07] | English: | A method of making alumina and MgO preheatable insulating refractory liners and methods of use thereof | [1989/07] | French: | Méthode de fabrication de garnissages isolants réfractaires et préchauffables em alumine et Mg0 et leur méthode d'utilisation | [1989/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 24.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/19] | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.1989 | 02.09.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0001327 ; | [Y]DE7619744U ; | [Y]EP0042897 ; | [E]US4703022 |