EP0261927 - Patient monitoring system having transportable data module and display unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARQUETTE ELECTRONICS, INC. Wisconsin Corporation 8200 West Tower Avenue Milwaukee Wisconsin 53223 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states MARQUETTE ELECTRONICS, INC. Wisconsin Corporation 8200 West Tower Avenue Milwaukee Wisconsin 53223 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cudahy, Michael J. 511 S. Ocean Blvd. Delray Beach Florida 33444 / US | 02 /
Huerga, Carlos De La 2100 E. Kensington Blvd. Shorewood Wisconsin 53211 / US | 03 /
Arneson, Harold N. S28 W29031 Carmathen Ct. Waukesha Wisconsin 53186 / US | 04 /
Divers, R. Thomas 10465 Circle Road Mequon Wisconsin 53092 / US | 05 /
Altman, Barry J. 3607 W. Marseilles Mequon Wisconsin 53092 / US | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308374.5 | 22.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | US19860912359 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: US 912359 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261927 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261927 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261927 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
A61B5/02055 (EP);
A61B5/339 (US);
A61B5/0205 (US);
A61B5/02438 (US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0443 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1988/13] | Title | German: | Patientenüberwachungseinrichtung mit transportierbaren Datenmodule und Anzeigegerät | [1993/46] | English: | Patient monitoring system having transportable data module and display unit | [1988/13] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance de malade comportant un module de données transportable et une unité de présentation | [1988/13] |
Former [1988/13] | Patientenüberwachungseinrichtung mit bewegbaren Datenmodule und Anzeigegerät | Examination procedure | 06.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4051522 (HEALY JAMES W, et al); | [A]US4216462 (DIGIACOMO REGIS P [US], et al); | [A]US4378021 (STRAND ERIC J [US]); | [X]US4546436 (SCHNEIDER WOLFGER [US], et al) |