EP0297190 - Apparatus for reducing blockage in body channels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/01] | Method and apparatus for reducing blockage in body channels | ||
[1993/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECLIPSE SURGICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Post Office Box 50875 Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states ECLIPSE SURGICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Post Office Box 50875 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | ||
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states MCM LABORATORIES INC 1945 Charleston Road Suite 103 Mountain View California 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murphy-Chutorian, Douglas Roger 84 Peter Coutts Circle Stanford California 94305 / US | 02 /
Mok, Walter Yiu-Wa 639 Seale Avenue Palo Alto California 94303 / US | 03 /
Leung, Kang Ming 3149 Ross Road Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes & Martin 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310734.6 | 07.12.1987 | [1989/01] | Priority number, date | US19870057791 | 03.06.1987 Original published format: US 57791 | [1989/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0297190 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0297190 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/36, A61B17/22 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
A61B18/245 (EP,US);
A61M25/09 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/01] | Title | German: | Apparat zur Reduzierung von Verstopfungen in Körperkanälen | [1993/35] | English: | Apparatus for reducing blockage in body channels | [1993/35] | French: | Appareil de réduction des obstructions dans les canaux corporels | [1993/35] |
Former [1989/01] | Methode und Apparat zur Reduzierung von Verstopfungen in Körperkanälen | ||
Former [1989/01] | Method and apparatus for reducing blockage in body channels | ||
Former [1989/01] | Méthode et appareillage de réduction des obstructions dans les canaux corporels | Examination procedure | 01.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 12.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.09.1993 | GR | 01.09.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/32] | AT | 01.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2945080 [ ] (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | WO8301893 [ ] (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | US4418688 [ ] (LOEB MARVIN P [US]); | EP0195375 [ ] (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) |