EP0287737 - Hydro-ball in-core instrumentation system and method of operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tower, Stephen Nelson 1151 Culp Road, RD No. 2 Apollo, PA 15613 / US | 02 /
Braun, Howard E. 1277 Bellerock Street Pittsburgh, PA 15217 / US | 03 /
Veronesi, Luciano 102 Glenn David Drive Blawnox, PA 15238 / US | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 87311220.5 | 18.12.1987 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | US19870042183 | 24.04.1987 Original published format: US 42183 | [1988/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0287737 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0287737 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287737 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G21C17/10 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
G21C17/108 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, LI [1988/43] | Title | German: | In-core-Instrumentierungssystem und Betriebsverfahren mit einer Vielzahl von Hydro-Bällen | [1988/43] | English: | Hydro-ball in-core instrumentation system and method of operation | [1988/43] | French: | Système instrumental "in-core" et méthode d'exploitation utilisant un grand nombre de balles-hydro | [1988/43] | Examination procedure | 02.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/41] | 23.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.03.1992 | CH | 11.03.1992 | FR | 11.03.1992 | LI | 11.03.1992 | ES | 22.06.1992 | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/03] | BE | 11.03.1992 | |
CH | 11.03.1992 | ||
LI | 11.03.1992 | ||
ES | 22.06.1992 | ||
FR | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/10] | BE | 11.03.1992 | |
CH | 11.03.1992 | ||
LI | 11.03.1992 | ||
FR | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | BE | 11.03.1992 | |
CH | 11.03.1992 | ||
LI | 11.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | CH | 11.03.1992 | |
LI | 11.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | DE1294575 [ ] (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP); | DE1539935 [ ] (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD); | US3075113 [ ] (KEITH SOAR GEOFFREY); | US3764736 [ ] (KOSKY R, et al); | US3711714 [ ] (KLAR E, et al); | US3930936 [ ] (ALEITE WERNER, et al); | US3932211 [ ] (LOVING JR JAMES J); | US4268354 [ ] (WASSEL WILLIAM W, et al); | JPS60256093 [ ] (TOSHIBA KK); | JPS60111994 [ ] (TOSHIBA KK) |