EP0265370 - Mobile steps for aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Frech AG Gewerbestrasse 4 CH-4450 Sissach / CH | [1988/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stark, Karl-Heinz Bertelweg 316 CH-4249 Himmelried / CH | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Paul David, et al Patentanwaltsbüro FELDMANN AG, Kanalstrasse 17 8152 Glattbrugg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Feldmann, Paul David, et al c/o Patentanwaltsbüro FELDMANN AG Kanalstrasse 17 CH-8152 Glattbrugg / CH | Application number, filing date | 87810508.9 | 03.09.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | CH19860004077 | 13.10.1986 Original published format: CH 407786 | [1988/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0265370 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/315 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
B64F1/315 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/17] | Title | German: | Mobile Flugzeugtreppe | [1988/17] | English: | Mobile steps for aircraft | [1988/17] | French: | Escalier mobile pour avion | [1988/17] | File destroyed: | 15.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 13.04.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/44] | 08.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2112290 ; | [X]CH509193 ; | [X]CH490991 ; | [A]GB594643 |