|
23.08.1994 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1994 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1994 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.1994 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.1994 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.02.1994 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.1994 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.1994 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.1994 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.10.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.10.1993 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.1993 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.1993 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.04.1992 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1991 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.12.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.12.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.12.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.12.1991 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1991 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1991 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1991 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.1991 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.05.1991 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1991 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1991 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1991 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.1991 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.02.1991 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
26.10.1990 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.01.1989 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1989 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1988 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1988 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1988 |
Refund 20 % filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1988 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1988 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1988 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1988 |
Subsequently filed documents not duly signed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1988 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
27.01.1988 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1987 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.1987 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.1987 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1987 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1987 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
27.10.1987 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1987 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1987 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.1987 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.1987 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.1987 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.1987 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.09.1987 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.09.1987 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.1987 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.1987 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
25.08.1987 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
17.03.1987 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |