|
21.04.2004 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
23.10.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.09.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2002 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.11.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.10.2000 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Annex |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Annex |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2000 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
03.02.1999 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1998 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.07.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1998 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
25.03.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
25.02.1998 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
14.01.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.1997 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.12.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.01.1996 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.12.1995 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.12.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1995 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.11.1995 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.11.1995 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1995 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.11.1995 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.08.1995 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.1994 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.1993 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.09.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
29.05.1992 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.1992 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.03.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.03.1992 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.11.1991 |
Registration/cancellation und. R21,22 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.1991 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.1991 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1991 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.12.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
17.12.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
17.12.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.08.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.1990 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1990 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1988 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1988 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1988 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.1988 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1987 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1987 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1987 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.1987 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.1987 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.1987 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.1987 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.1987 |
Notice informing of designated offices |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.1987 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.1987 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.08.1987 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
17.03.1987 |
Notification of designations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1987 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |