EP0259468 - CYCLODEXTRINCLATHRATES OF CARBACYCLINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS MEDICINAL DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKUBALLA, Werner Olwenstr. 13 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 02 /
VORBRÜGGEN, Helmut Wilkestr. 7 D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE | 03 /
DAHL, Helmut Gollanczstr. 102 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 04 /
STÜRZEBECHER, Claus-Steffen Brigittenstr. 6a D-1000 Berlin 46 / DE | 05 /
THIERAUCH, Karl-Heinz Hochwildpfad 45 D-1000 Berlin 37 / DE | [1991/20] |
Former [1988/11] | 01 /
SKUBALLA, Werner Olwenstrasse 13 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | ||
02 /
VORBRÜGGEN, Helmut Wilkestrasse 7 D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE | |||
03 /
DAHL, Helmut Gollanczstrasse 102 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | |||
04 /
STÜRZEBECHER, Claus-Steffen Brigittenstrasse 6a D-1000 Berlin 46 / DE | |||
05 /
THIERAUCH, Karl-Heinz Hochwildpfad 45 D-1000 Berlin 37 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87902041.0 | 09.03.1987 | [1988/11] | WO1987DE00106 | Priority number, date | DE19863608088 | 07.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3608088 | [1988/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705294 | Date: | 11.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0259468 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0259468 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C405/00, C08B37/16, A61K31/557 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/6951 (EP,US);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1988/11] | C07C177/00, C08B37/16, A61K31/557 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/11] | Title | German: | CYCLODEXTRINCLATHRATE VON CARBACYCLINDERIVATEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL | [1988/11] | English: | CYCLODEXTRINCLATHRATES OF CARBACYCLINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS MEDICINAL DRUGS | [1988/11] | French: | CYCLODEXTRINECLATHRATES DE DERIVES DE CARBACYCLINE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS | [1988/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.1987 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 01.03.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 10.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 24.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Request for further processing for: | 19.02.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 15.05.1991 | [1992/16] | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2128674 ; | [Y]EP0011591 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | JPS56150039 [ ] (SANKYO CO); | [Y]EP0119949 (SCHERING AG [DE]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19820329), vol. 96, no. 13, Database accession no. 103964D, page 680 |