|
26.09.1995 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.07.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.1994 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.05.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.05.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
02.05.1994 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.01.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.01.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.1994 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.1994 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.1993 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.08.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.1993 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.06.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1993 |
Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.1992 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.08.1992 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.08.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
01.06.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.1992 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.02.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.12.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.08.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.04.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.1991 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.01.1990 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1989 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1988 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1988 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.1988 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.06.1988 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.06.1988 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1987 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1987 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.1987 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.1987 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1987 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.1987 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
24.09.1987 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
27.04.1987 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |