EP0301033 - DISPOSABLE FIXING MEANS ESPECIALLY FOR FIXING FRACTURED SMALL TUBULAR BONES EXTERNALLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1994 [1994/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CZIFFER, ENDRE Bakats u. 5, II. em 5 H-1093 Budapest / HU | For all designated states SZACSKY, Mihály Városmajor u. 26/b H-1122 Budapest / HU | For all designated states BAGITS, Tibor Lékai János tér 15 H-1124 Budapest / HU | [1989/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/05] | Representative(s) | Eitle, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Eitle, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87906094.5 | 15.09.1987 | [1989/05] | WO1987HU00038 | Priority number, date | HU19870000206 | 23.01.1987 Original published format: HU 20687 | [1989/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8805288 | Date: | 28.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0301033 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0301033 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 28.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/60 | [1989/05] | CPC: |
A61B17/60 (EP,US);
A61B17/6433 (EP,US);
A61B17/66 (EP,US);
Y10S606/906 (EP,US);
Y10S606/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/05] | Title | German: | WEGWERFBEFESTIGUNGSMITTEL, INSBESONDERE ZUR ÄUSSEREN BEFESTIGUNG KLEINER GEBROCHENER ROHRFÖRMIGER KNOCHEN | [1989/05] | English: | DISPOSABLE FIXING MEANS ESPECIALLY FOR FIXING FRACTURED SMALL TUBULAR BONES EXTERNALLY | [1989/05] | French: | MOYENS DE FIXATION JETABLES SERVANT NOTAMMENT A FIXER EXTERIEUREMENT DE PETITS OS TUBULAIRES FRACTURES | [1989/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1988 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 25.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2806207 (LUHR HANS GEORG PROF DR DR); | [A]GB2069846 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]GB2086231 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]GB2158716 (TECHNOMED GMK) | Examination | - Müller: "Manual der Osteosynthese", Springer Verlag 1977, pages VII-IX; 20-21, 62-67, 104-107 |