EP0302898 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MACHINING BOTH SIDES OF WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDEX-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG HAHN & TESSKY KBO, Postfach 249 D-73726 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | For all designated states INDEX-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG HAHN & TESSKY KBO, Postfach 249 D-73726 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINK, Helmut, Friedrich Obere Burgstra e 43 D-7307 Aichwald 1 / DE | 02 /
TRAUTMANN, Günther Bosslerstra e 7 D-7312 Kirchheim-Nabern / DE | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 87906563.9 | 09.10.1987 | [1989/07] | WO1987DE00459 | Priority number, date | DE19863634363 | 09.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3634363 | DE19873709668 | 24.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3709668 | [1989/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8802678 | Date: | 21.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302898 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0302898 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q7/04 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
B23Q7/04 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2514 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2524 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1992/13] |
Former [1989/07] | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEIDSEITIGEN BEARBEITEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN | [1989/07] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MACHINING BOTH SIDES OF WORKPIECES | [1989/07] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'USINAGE DE PIECES SUR LES DEUX FACES | [1989/07] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.1988 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/07] | 18.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB1442598 [ ] (WICKMAN MACH TOOL SALES LTD); | CH659017 [ ] (JAUCH KURT); | DE3212268 [ ] (WEISSER SOEHNE J G); | DE1264927 [ ] (GILDEMEISTER WERKZEUGMASCH); | GB936257 [ ] (GILDEMEISTER WERKZEUGMASCH); | GB2087273 [ ] (GILDEMEISTER AG); | DE2942060 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |