EP0324795 - WHEEL-CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANECKER, Benno Grafing 11 D-8201 Halfing / DE | [1989/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Andrae/Flach/Haug/Kneissl Prinzregentenstrasse 24 D-83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 87907322.9 | 05.11.1987 | [1989/30] | WO1987EP00679 | Priority number, date | DE19863638091 | 07.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3638091 | [1989/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803399 | Date: | 19.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0324795 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0324795 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/00 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
A61G5/00 (EP,US);
A61G5/085 (EP,US);
A61G5/0891 (EP,US);
A61G5/121 (EP,US);
A61G5/125 (EP,US);
A61G5/128 (EP,US);
A61G2203/723 (EP,US);
A61G5/02 (EP,US);
A61G5/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/30] | Title | German: | ROLLSTUHL | [1989/30] | English: | WHEEL-CHAIR | [1989/30] | French: | FAUTEUIL ROULANT | [1989/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1989 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 06.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 22.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.01.1992 | FR | 29.01.1992 | GB | 29.01.1992 | IT | 29.01.1992 | NL | 29.01.1992 | SE | 29.01.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 29.01.1992 | |
GB | 29.01.1992 | ||
IT | 29.01.1992 | ||
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
FR | 19.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/14] | BE | 29.01.1992 | |
GB | 29.01.1992 | ||
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
FR | 19.06.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | BE | 29.01.1992 | |
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
FR | 19.06.1992 | ||
Former [1992/38] | BE | 29.01.1992 | |
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | NL | 29.01.1992 | |
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | SE | 29.01.1992 | Cited in | International search | GB1216476 [ ] (TRIANG PEDIGREE LTD [GB]); | FR2307697 [ ] (METABIO [FR]); | FR2441362 [ ] (BERGMAN PER [SE]); | US4300249 [ ] (TAYLOR FRANCIS H); | FR2515031 [ ] (SPASTICS SOC [GB]); | FR2526311 [ ] (SINCOPLAS [FR]); | DE3304793 [ ] (OLIVER KLEIN GMBH [DE]); | DE8521183U [ ]; | US4593929 [ ] (WILLIAMS RONALD H [US]); | DE3526985 [ ] (QUEISSER KLAUS) | Examination | WO8501205 |