|
26.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1997 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.1996 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.11.1996 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.11.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
02.11.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.1996 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1996 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.10.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.10.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.10.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1996 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1996 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1996 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1996 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1996 |
F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.1996 |
F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.07.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.06.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.02.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
31.01.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.12.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1995 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.10.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
05.10.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.09.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.08.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.08.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.07.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.05.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.09.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.08.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.06.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.05.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.04.1994 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1994 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1994 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1994 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1994 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.10.1993 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1993 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.06.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1993 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
05.08.1992 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1992 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1992 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1992 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.01.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.01.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
07.01.1992 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1991 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.1991 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
02.09.1991 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1989 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.1988 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1988 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1988 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
01.07.1988 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.05.1988 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.1988 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
08.12.1987 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |