EP0279213 - Fluorescence polarization immunoassay for amphetamine/methamphetamine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 1 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brynes, Paul Jeffrey 228 Brookhill Road Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 02 /
Martinus, Janis Allison 33540 Royal Oak Lane Wildwood, IL 60030 / US | 03 /
Smith, Catherine M. 907 Orchid Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | 04 /
Molina, Cynthia Martha 2016 Maple Avenue Northbrook, IL 60062 / US | 05 /
Vaughan, Kenward Shaw 2805 LaGran Via Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [1992/43] |
Former [1988/34] | 01 /
Brynes, Paul Jeffrey 228 Brookhill Road Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | ||
02 /
Martinus, Janis Allison 33540 Royal Oak Lane Wildwood Illinois 60030 / US | |||
03 /
Smith, Catherine M. 907 Orchid Way Carlsbad California 92008 / US | |||
04 /
Molina, Cynthia Martha 2016 Maple Avenue Northbrook Illinois 60062 / US | |||
05 /
Vaughan, Kenward Shaw 2805 LaGran Via Carlsbad California 92008 / US | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. Zini, Maranesi & C. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88100958.3 | 22.01.1988 | [1988/34] | Priority number, date | US19870010355 | 03.02.1987 Original published format: US 10355 | [1988/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0279213 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0279213 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/533, G01N33/94 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
G01N33/946 (EP,US);
G01N33/533 (EP,US);
Y10S436/808 (EP,US);
Y10S436/816 (EP,US);
Y10S436/901 (EP,US);
Y10T436/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/34] | Title | German: | Fluoreszenzpolarisationsimmunassay für Amphetamin/Methamphetamin | [1988/34] | English: | Fluorescence polarization immunoassay for amphetamine/methamphetamine | [1988/34] | French: | Essai immunologique de fluorescence et de polarisation pour amphétamine/méthamphétamine | [1988/34] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/17] | 03.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0199042 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [X]EP0201751 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [XP]EP0218010 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [YP]EP0240021 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [Y]US4041076 (AVENIA RICHARD WILLIAM, et al) | [X] - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 32, no. 9, September 1986, pages 1677-1681, Washington, DC, US; C.J. HALFMAN et al.: "Homogeneous, micelle quenching fluoroimmunoassay for detecting amphetamines in urine" | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, 26th August 1985, page 8, abstract no. 64284y, Columbus, Ohio, US; D.L. COLBERT et al.: "Single-reagent polarization fluoroimmunoassay for amphetamine in urine", & CLIN. CHEM. (WINSTON-SALEM, N.C.) 1985, 31(7), 1193-5 | Examination | US3856469 | - CHEMICAL PATHOLOGY, 4th edition, 1982; p. 213< |