|
31.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2002 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2002 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2002 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2002 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
30 |
|
29.05.2001 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.05.2001 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Annex |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
20.04.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2001 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2001 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.02.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.10.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.07.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.1998 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.05.1998 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.05.1998 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.1998 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.1998 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.04.1998 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.1998 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
26.01.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.1998 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.01.1998 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1997 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1997 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1997 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.05.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1997 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.03.1997 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
19 |
|
28.02.1997 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.02.1997 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
21 |
|
01.02.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1996 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.06.1996 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1996 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.1996 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1996 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.02.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.02.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.01.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1995 |
Refusal of request for correction after grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.1995 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.09.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.05.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.05.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.05.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.03.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.02.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
22.12.1993 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.05.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.06.1990 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.1990 |
File inspection (Information for the national office) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.1990 |
Notice about sending of the file copy to the national office |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1989 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.1988 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1988 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1988 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1988 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1988 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1988 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |