EP0307535 - Method for continuous embossing the surface of a cold prefabricated thermoplastic sheet by heat and pressure using an embossing roller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. H. Benecke AG Beneckeallee 40 D-30419 Hannover / DE | [1989/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böttcher, Hugo Freihorstfeld 40 D-3000 Hannover 71 / DE | 02 /
Heimrich, Klaus Am kahlen Berg 15 D-3008 Garbsen 6 / DE | 03 /
Hildebrandt, Gustav Wilhelm-Busch-Strasse 14 D-3262 Auetal / DE | 04 /
Kracke, Heinrich, Dr. Backhausstrasse 15 D-3160 Lehrte / DE | 05 /
Richter, Johannes Wittinger Strasse 53 D-3100 Celle / DE | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Leine, Sigurd, et al Leine & Wagner Patentanwälte Burckhardtstrasse 1 30163 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | Leine, Sigurd, Dipl.-Ing., et al LEINE & KÖNIG Patentanwälte Burckhardtstrasse 1 D-30163 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 88102135.6 | 23.08.1984 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | DE19833333179 | 14.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3333179 | DE19843405985 | 20.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3405985 | [1989/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0307535 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0307535 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307535 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C59/04 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
B29D99/0035 (EP,US);
B29C33/405 (EP,US);
B29C59/04 (EP,US);
B29D7/01 (EP,US);
B44B5/026 (EP,US);
B29K2883/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1989/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum kontinuierlichen Prägen der Oberfläche einer vorgefertigten, kalten thermoplastischen Kunststoffolie unter Wärme und Druck mittels einer Prägewalze | [1989/12] | English: | Method for continuous embossing the surface of a cold prefabricated thermoplastic sheet by heat and pressure using an embossing roller | [1989/12] | French: | Procédé pour le gauffrage continu de la surface d'une feuille préfabriquée, refroidie, en matière thermoplastique, par chauffage et pression en utilisant un rouleau de gauffrage | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 06.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84110052.2 / EP0144541 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1071937 ; | [X]GB776986 (ELMER SZANTAY); | [X]US2928124 (HUGGER RICHARD H); | [X]US3024154 (SINGLETON FRANKLIN J, et al); | [A]DE1161002 (KLEINEWEFERS SOEHNE J); | [X]FR2210512 (ARMSTRONG CORK CO [US]); | [A]DE2401292 (ETHYL CORP); | [X]FR2296506 (HAZELETT STRIP CASTING CORP [US]); | [X]EP0048948 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |