EP0283708 - Radio receiver with two traffic radio decoders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/39] | Radio receiver with at least a traffic radio decoder | ||
[1993/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 W-7000 Stuttgart 30 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brägas, Peter Hausbergring 49 D-3200 Hildesheim / DE | [1988/39] | Application number, filing date | 88102231.3 | 16.02.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | DE19873709523 | 23.03.1987 Original published format: DE 3709523 | [1988/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0283708 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0283708 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0283708 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/09 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
H04H20/55 (EP,US);
G08G1/093 (EP,US);
H04H20/34 (EP,US);
H04H60/27 (EP,US);
H04H2201/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1988/39] | Title | German: | Rundfunkempfänger mit zwei Verkehrsfunkdecodern | [1993/05] | English: | Radio receiver with two traffic radio decoders | [1993/05] | French: | Récepteur radio avec deux décodeurs radio du trafic | [1993/05] |
Former [1988/39] | Rundfunkempfänger mit mindestens einem Verkehrsfunkdecoder | ||
Former [1988/39] | Radio receiver with at least a traffic radio decoder | ||
Former [1988/39] | Récepteur radio avec au moins un décodeur radio du trafic | Examination procedure | 16.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 17.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0200977 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]) | [X] - FUNKSCHAU, Band 58, Nr. 1, Januar 1986, Seiten 43-47, München, DE; W. HINZ: "Neue Entwicklung auf Hörfunkwellen" | [A] - FUNKTECHNIK, Band 41, Nr. 7, Juli 1986, Seiten 273-278, Heidelberg, DE; C. REUBER: "Elektronik für Information und Navigation im Auto" |