EP0328702 - Deodorant composition and containment apparatus for enclosed spaces, in particular for cars, houses and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.1990 [1990/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNT S.N.C. DI INVERNIZZI SILVANO E TOZZI DINA Via Gagliani 5 40069 Zola Predosa (Bologna) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states SYNT S.N.C. DI INVERNIZZI SILVANO E TOZZI DINA Via Gagliani 5 I-40069 Zola Predosa (Bologna) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Invernizzi, Silvano Via Gagliani 5 I-40069 Zola Predosa (Province Bologna) / IT | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88102286.7 | 17.02.1988 | [1989/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0328702 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/04, A61L9/01 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
A61L9/01 (EP);
A61L9/042 (EP);
A61L9/046 (EP);
A61L9/12 (EP);
B60H3/0007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1989/34] | Title | German: | Deodorierungszusammenstellung und Behälter für einen geschlossenen Raum, besonders für Autos, Häuser und ähnliches | [1989/34] | English: | Deodorant composition and containment apparatus for enclosed spaces, in particular for cars, houses and the like | [1989/34] | French: | Composition déodorante et boîtier pour espace fermé, en particulier pour automobiles, maisons et similaires | [1989/34] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/41] | 17.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.03.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2871526 ; | [X]EP0105539 ; | [Y]FR1596401 ; | [Y]FR1500142 ; | [A]US3661838 ; | [A]US3767787 |