|
12.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2001 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
25 |
|
19.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.12.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
02.06.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.04.1998 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.1998 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1998 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.10.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
81 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
58 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
13 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
05.05.1995 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1994 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.1994 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.07.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.09.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.07.1993 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1993 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.03.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1992 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1992 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1991 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.1991 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
08.11.1991 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.07.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.1988 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1988 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.1988 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.1988 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |