EP0295641 - Loudspeaker system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saiki, Syuji 11-88-208, Okayamate-cho Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Sato, Kazue 676-73, Oaza neya Neyagawa-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Honda, Kazuki 3-303, Myokenzaka 6-chome Katano-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 88109508.7 | 15.06.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | JP19870149647 | 16.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14964787 | JP19870177427 | 16.07.1987 Original published format: JP 17742787 | JP19870248718 | 01.10.1987 Original published format: JP 24871887 | JP19880068563 | 22.03.1988 Original published format: JP 6856388 | [1988/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0295641 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0295641 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295641 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/28 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
H04R1/2857 (EP,US);
H04R1/2865 (EP,US);
H04R1/2834 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/51] | Title | German: | Lautsprechersystem | [1988/51] | English: | Loudspeaker system | [1988/51] | French: | Système de haut-parleur | [1988/51] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57185789 ; | [A]FR2470511 (FAUGERAS ALAIN [FR]); | [A]US3669215 (KIKUCHI TAKEO, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 33 (E-157)[1178], 9th February 1983; & JP-A-57 185 789 (SONY K.K.) 16-11-1982, & JP57185789 A 00000000 |