EP0319659 - Process for producing composite laminate comprising insert part and injection-molded part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF ENGINEERING PLASTICS CO., LTD. 3-3, Kioicho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | [1992/09] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Yuka Badische Co., Ltd. 1000, Kawajiri-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Naoyuki c/o Mitsubishi Yuka Badische Co., Ltd. 1000, Kawajiri-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie / JP | 02 /
Aoki, Masahiro c/o Mitsubishi Yuka Badische Co., Ltd. 1000, Kawajiri-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie / JP | 03 /
Tsukamoto, Takeo c/o Mitsubishi Yuka Badische Co., Ltd. 1000, Kawajiri-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie / JP | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88115013.0 | 14.09.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | JP19870311731 | 09.12.1987 Original published format: JP 31173187 | JP19870311732 | 09.12.1987 Original published format: JP 31173287 | JP19880112144 | 09.05.1988 Original published format: JP 11214488 | [1989/34] |
Former [1989/24] | JP19870311731 | 09.12.1987 | |
JP19870311732 | 09.12.1987 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0319659 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0319659 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, C08J5/12 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
B29C45/14311 (EP);
C08J5/124 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/24] | B29C45/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines ein Einsatzteil und ein Spritzteil enthaltenden Verbundlaminates | [1989/24] | English: | Process for producing composite laminate comprising insert part and injection-molded part | [1989/24] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de stratifiés composites comprenant un élément d'insertion et une partie moulée par injection | [1989/24] | File destroyed: | 14.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 14.02.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2093754 ; | [Y]US4529772 ; | [A]DE3116339 ; | [A]US4193902 ; | [A]JPS6119320 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 167 (M-488)[2223]13th January 1986; & JP-A-61 019 320 (SHARP K.K.) 28-01-1986 |