EP0314908 - Automatic determination of labels and markov word models in a speech recognition system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Peter Fitzhugh 548 East 82nd Street Apt. 5B New York, NY 10 028 / US | 02 /
De Souza, Peter Vincent 1301 Whitehill Road Yorktown Height, NY 10 598 / US | 03 /
Nahamoo, David 12 Elmwood Road White Plains, NY 10 605 / UA | 04 /
Picheny, Michael Alan 118 Ralph Avenue White Plains, NY 10 606 / US | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Jost, Ottokarl IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Jost, Ottokarl, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88115174.0 | 16.09.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | US19870115505 | 30.10.1987 Original published format: US 115505 | [1989/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0314908 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0314908 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314908 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/06 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
G10L15/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/19] | Title | German: | Automatische Bestimmung von Kennzeichen und Markov-Wortmodellen in einem Spracherkennungssystem | [1989/19] | English: | Automatic determination of labels and markov word models in a speech recognition system | [1989/19] | French: | Détermination automatique d'étiquettes et de représentations de mots par des modèles de Markov dans un système pour la reconnaissance de la parole | [1989/19] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/40] | 18.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0243009 ; | [AD]EP0238691 ; | [AD]EP0238697 |