EP0313987 - Electric switch for a power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON Corporation 735-5 Higashishiokouji-cho, Karasumadoori-7-Jousagaru, Simogyou-ku Kyoto / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | For all designated states OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagata, Kunio c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Kazusaka, Shoji c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 03 /
Nozoe, Satoshi c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 04 /
Sano, Takezo c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 05 /
Asa, Junzo c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 06 /
Morita, Saburou c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | [1989/30] |
Former [1989/18] | 01 /
Nagata, Kunio c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | ||
02 /
Kazusaka, Shoji c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | |||
03 /
Nozoe, Satoshi c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | |||
04 /
Sano, Takezo c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | |||
05 /
Asa, Junza c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | |||
06 /
Morita, Saburou c/o OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. Patent Center 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117477.5 | 20.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | JP19870267457 | 21.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26745787 | JP19870161513U | 21.10.1987 Original published format: JP 16151387 U | JP19870269824 | 24.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26982487 | JP19880051098U | 15.04.1988 Original published format: JP 5109888 U | JP19880052954U | 20.04.1988 Original published format: JP 5295488 U | JP19880055484U | 23.04.1988 Original published format: JP 5548488 U | JP19880055752U | 25.04.1988 Original published format: JP 5575288 U | [1989/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0313987 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313987 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/06, H01H21/10 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
H01H9/061 (EP);
H01H9/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/18] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Schalter für Elektrowerkzeug | [1989/18] | English: | Electric switch for a power tool | [1989/18] | French: | Interrupteur électrique pour outil électrique | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1988 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.1993 | BE | 23.06.1993 | CH | 23.06.1993 | ES | 23.06.1993 | FR | 23.06.1993 | GR | 23.06.1993 | IT | 23.06.1993 | LI | 23.06.1993 | SE | 23.06.1993 | LU | 31.10.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 23.06.1993 | |
BE | 23.06.1993 | ||
CH | 23.06.1993 | ||
ES | 23.06.1993 | ||
GR | 23.06.1993 | ||
IT | 23.06.1993 | ||
LI | 23.06.1993 | ||
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
LU | 31.10.1993 | ||
FR | 12.11.1993 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 23.06.1993 | |
BE | 23.06.1993 | ||
CH | 23.06.1993 | ||
GR | 23.06.1993 | ||
IT | 23.06.1993 | ||
LI | 23.06.1993 | ||
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
LU | 31.10.1993 | ||
FR | 12.11.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 23.06.1993 | |
BE | 23.06.1993 | ||
CH | 23.06.1993 | ||
IT | 23.06.1993 | ||
LI | 23.06.1993 | ||
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
FR | 12.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 23.06.1993 | |
BE | 23.06.1993 | ||
CH | 23.06.1993 | ||
LI | 23.06.1993 | ||
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
FR | 12.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 23.06.1993 | |
CH | 23.06.1993 | ||
LI | 23.06.1993 | ||
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | CH | 23.06.1993 | |
LI | 23.06.1993 | ||
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | CH | 23.06.1993 | |
LI | 23.06.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JPS6222331 (MAKITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD, et al); | [X]US4179644 (VASSOS LOUIS J [US]); | [A]EP0048124 (SKIL NEDERLAND NV [NL]); | [A]DE2211027 | by applicant | JPS6222331 | JPS60160916 |