EP0315175 - Self-averaging pitot tube probe for measuring fluid flow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/19] | Self-averaging pitot tube probe and method for measuring fluid flow | ||
[1996/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRESO INDUSTRIES P.O. Box 154 Plattsburgh New York 12901 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states PRESO INDUSTRIES P.O. Box 154 Plattsburgh New York 12901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taha, Sami H. 3035 Sartelon Street St. Laurent Quebec H4R 1E6 / CA | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Grams, Klaus Dieter, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118328.9 | 03.11.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | US19870116590 | 04.11.1987 Original published format: US 116590 | [1989/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0315175 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0315175 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315175 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/46 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
G01F1/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Selbstmittelnde Pitot-Rohrsonde zur Messung eines Flüssigkeitsdurchflusses | [1996/05] | English: | Self-averaging pitot tube probe for measuring fluid flow | [1996/05] | French: | Sonde à tube de Pitot auto-moyenneur de mesure du flux d'un fluide | [1996/05] |
Former [1989/19] | Selbstmittelnde Pitot-Rohrsonde und Methode zur Messung eines Flüssigkeitsdurchflusses | ||
Former [1989/19] | Self-averaging pitot tube probe and method for measuring fluid flow | ||
Former [1989/19] | Sonde à tube de Pitot auto-moyenneur et méthode de mesure du flux d'un fluide | Examination procedure | 08.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/28] | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1473126 (METRAWATT AG) | [X] - TRANSACTIONS OF THE ASME, vol. 78, no. 5, July 1956, pages 1079-1089; F. NUMACHI et al: "Streamlined pitot-tube bar for measuring water flow in large pipe" | [A] - TRANSACTIONS OF THE ASME, vol. 78, no. 7, October 1956, pages 1447-1460; R.G. FOLSOM et al.: "Review of the pitot tube" |