EP0316804 - Reactive power controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirose, Syunichi Towacoop 2, 1-9-11 Kinuta Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Furuhashi, Takeshi 6-202 Tenpakujyutaku, 301 Yokomachi Tempaku-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118831.2 | 11.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | JP19870284216 | 12.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28421687 | [1989/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0316804 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0316804 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/70, H02J3/18 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
G05F1/70 (EP,US);
H02J3/1842 (EP,US);
Y02E40/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [1989/21] | Title | German: | Blindleistungsregler | [1989/21] | English: | Reactive power controller | [1989/21] | French: | Régulateur de puissance réactive | [1989/21] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 11.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS5944646B ; | [A]DE3708468 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |