EP0282122 - Load carrying floor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.01.1995 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Talson Transport Engineering B.V. Vondellaan 15 NL-5591 CK Heeze / NL | [1988/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thunnissen, Kees Wim Boslaan 50 NL-5691 CX Son / NL | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Boelsma, Gerben Harm, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | Boelsma, Gerben Harm, Ir., et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 88200368.4 | 24.02.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | NL19870000453 | 24.02.1987 Original published format: NL 8700453 | [1988/37] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282122 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282122 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/52, B60P1/36 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
B60P1/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/37] | Title | German: | Lasttragender Boden | [1988/37] | English: | Load carrying floor | [1988/37] | French: | Plancher de chargement | [1988/37] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 27.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1992
21.05.1992
ADMISSIBLE Ancra Jungfalk GmbH Richard-Stocker-Str. 19 D-78234 Engen / DE Opponent's representative Hiebsch, Gerhard F., et al, et al Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1992
21.05.1992
ADMISSIBLE Ancra Jungfalk GmbH Richard-Stocker-Str. 19 D-78234 Engen / DE Opponent's representative Hiebsch, Gerhard F., et al, et al Hiebsch Behrmann Nüsse Patentanwälte Postfach 464 78204 Singen / DE | ||
Former [1992/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1992
21.05.1992
ADMISSIBLE Ancra Jungfalk GmbH Richard-Stocker-Str. 19 D-78234 Engen / DE Opponent's representative Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Hiebsch & Peege Patentanwälte Postfach 464 D-78204 Singen / DE | 13.05.1992 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 19.05.1992 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 04.06.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.01.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.09.1994 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 09.10.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB543658 (BROMILOW AND EDWARDS LTD, et al); | [A]CH447932 (RAPIDS STANDARD CO INC [US]); | [A]GB1315926 (DUSZKA S); | [YD]EP0002106 (HYDRAROLL LTD [GB]); | [AD]EP0081695 (SCHUCHEN ROBERT ERICH [DE]) |