EP0293974 - Use of sulfomucopolysaccharides in the therapeutical treatment of Alzheimer-type senile dementia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crinos Industria Farmacobiologica S.p.A. Piazza XX Settembre, n. 2 I-22079 Villa Guardia Como / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states Crinos Industria Farmacobiologica S.p.A. Piazza XX Settembre, n. 2 I-22079 Villa Guardia Como / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornelli, Umberto Via Beato Angelico 23/A I-20133 Milano / IT | 02 /
Ban, Thomas A. 2304 Valley Brook Road Nashville TN 37215 / US | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al SAIC BREVETTI s.r.l. Galleria San Babila, 4/D I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88201047.3 | 24.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | IT19870020698 | 28.05.1987 Original published format: IT 2069887 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293974 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293974 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/725 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Sulfomucopolysacchariden zur therapeutischen Behandlung von Krankheiten des Alzheimertyps | [1988/49] | English: | Use of sulfomucopolysaccharides in the therapeutical treatment of Alzheimer-type senile dementia | [1988/49] | French: | Utilisation de sulfomucopolysaccharides dans le traitement thérapeutique de la démence sénile du type Alzheimer | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 11.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MODERNE ARZNEIMITTEL, 5th edition, 1980, pages 945-946; "Ateroid" | [A] - LA CLINICA TERAPEUTICA, vol. 120, no. 3, 15th February 1987, pages 219-226; F. ASTENGO et al.: "Confronto in doppio cieco fra un mucopolisaccaride solforato e placebo nel trattamento di pazienti anziani con insufficienza cerebrovascolare" | [A] - THE MERCK MANNUAL, 14th edition, 1982, pages 1305-1309; "Dementia" | [A] - MINERVA MED., vol. 60, suppl. 99, pages 5082-5086; E. SFONDRINI et al.: "Controlli elettroencefalografici ed audiometrici in soggetti arteriosclerotici di età presenile e senile sottoposti a trattamento con complesso sulfomucopolisaccaridico estrattivo *) ad attività fibrinolitica" |