EP0302542 - Apparatus for the transport of carriers from and to a positioning device, and selection device for use in such an apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouwens, Henricus Johannes Joseph c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Bertram, Albert Ralph Johan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 88201463.2 | 11.07.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | NL19870001649 | 14.07.1987 Original published format: NL 8701649 | [1989/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302542 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0302542 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/00, B23Q7/10, B65G65/00 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
H05K13/0061 (EP,US);
H05K13/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ein- und Ausführen von Trägern in einem Positionierungsgerät und Wähleinrichtung zum Anwenden in einer derartigen Vorrichtung | [1989/06] | English: | Apparatus for the transport of carriers from and to a positioning device, and selection device for use in such an apparatus | [1989/06] | French: | Dispositif pour transporter des supports à partir et en direction d'un dispositif de positionnement et dispositif sélecteur destiné à un dispositif | [1989/06] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 28.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3431349 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]FR2008956 (SEVECO SA); | [A]GB1202361 (DAVID THEODORE NELSON WILLIAMS [GB], et al); | [A]EP0076238 (GIORGIONI A & C [IT]) | [ ] - ASSEMBLY AUTOMATION, Band 7, Nr. 2, Mai 1987, Seiten 58-63, IFS (Publications) Ltd; J. BOUMAN et al.: "Automation and redesign - a recipe for successful assembly" | [ ] - J. HARTLEY: "Flexible Automation in Japan", 1984, Seiten 163-166, "Hitachi follows the robot road" |