EP0304132 - Flame retardant organic substrates containing polymeric flame retardants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parr, William John E. 1506 Applegate Drive Naperville Illinois 60565 / US | [1989/08] | Representative(s) | Greiber, Karl Dieter, et al Lilienstrasse 5 66763 Dillingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | Greiber, Karl Dieter, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Patent Department Velperweg 76 P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1989/08] | Sieders, René AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 88201755.1 | 17.08.1988 | [1989/08] | Priority number, date | US19870088166 | 21.08.1987 Original published format: US 88166 | [1989/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0304132 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0304132 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/03, C08L65/04, C08L101/00, // (C08L101/00, 65:04) | [1989/08] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08G61/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/22 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L71/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/08] | Title | German: | Flammhemmende organische Substrate aus der Basis polymerer Flammschutzmittel | [1989/08] | English: | Flame retardant organic substrates containing polymeric flame retardants | [1989/08] | French: | Supports organiques retardateurs de flamme contenant des retardateurs de flamme polymères | [1989/08] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 19.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3360574 (MANUEL BALLESTER, et al); | [A]US3671469 (DOORENBOS HAROLD E); | [A]US3413241 (LE SUER WILLIAM M, et al) |