|
04.10.1999 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.1999 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.1999 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.1999 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1999 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1999 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1998 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.1998 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.04.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.1998 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1997 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.1997 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1996 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.07.1996 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.1996 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1996 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1996 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1995 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.1995 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
16.03.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.1995 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1994 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1994 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1994 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1994 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.11.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.11.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
18.11.1994 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.09.1994 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.1994 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.1994 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1994 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1994 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1994 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1994 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1994 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.1994 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1994 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1994 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1994 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.07.1994 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1994 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.08.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1993 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
12.03.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.10.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1992 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1992 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
16.10.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.09.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1992 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.08.1991 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.04.1991 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.04.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.1991 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1991 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.1991 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1991 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.1991 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
05.02.1991 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.1991 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
09.07.1990 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1990 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Deletion of the entry relating to the representative ('et al' case) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.1989 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1989 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
2 |