EP0320041 - Multi-access device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
AT
Alcatel N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | For:BE
BELL TELEPHONE MANUFACTURING COMPANY Naamloze Vennootschap Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerp / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
AT
ALCATEL N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | ||
For:BE
BELL TELEPHONE MANUFACTURING COMPANY Naamloze Vennootschap Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerp / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rabaey, Dirk Herman Lutgardis Cornelius Rode Dreef 18 B-2110 Wijegem / BE | 02 /
Haspeslagh, Didier René Tieltsestraat 10 B-8750 Harelbeke / BE | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Vermeersch, Robert, et al BELL TELEPHONE MANUFACTURING COMPANY Naamloze Vennootschap Patent Department Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | Vermeersch, Robert, et al BELL TELEPHONE MANUFACTURING COMPANY Naamloze Vennootschap Patent Department Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 88202675.0 | 24.11.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | BE19870001402 | 07.12.1987 Original published format: BE 8701402 | [1989/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0320041 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0320041 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0320041 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/18 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0414 (EP,US);
G06F13/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/24] | Title | German: | Mehrfachzugriffsvorrichtung | [1989/24] | English: | Multi-access device | [1989/24] | French: | Dispositif d'accès multiple | [1989/24] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0025731 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | [A]WO8202102 (NCR CO [US]); | [A]US4514823 (MENDELSON RICHARD N [US], et al); | [A]WO8604434 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | [A] - IEEE ELECTRO, vol. 7, May 1982, pages 1-11(34/2), New York, US; M. BAZES et al.: "A system-oriented RAM controller" | [A] - MICROPROCESSORS AND MICROSYSTEMS, vol. 10, no. 1, January/February 1986, pages 3-10, Butterworth & Co. (Publishers) Ltd, London, GB; V.L. NARASIMHAN et al.: "Design and evaluation of a dual-microcomputer shared memory system with a shared I/O bus" |