EP0277782 - Load-lifting mast especially adapted for use with automatically-guided vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASCADE CORPORATION 2201 N.E. 201st Portland Oregon 97230 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states CASCADE CORPORATION 2201 N.E. 201st Portland Oregon 97230 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaibler, Dennis W. 3235 S.W. Wallula Gresham Oregon 97080 / US | 02 /
Skinner, Jeffrey R. 2211 N.E. 244th Avenue Camas Washington 98607 / US | 03 /
Edwards, Alan T. 7011 S.W. Corbett Portland Oregon 97219 / US | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Skerrett, John Norton Haigh, et al Wilson Gunn Skerrett, Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Skerrett, John Norton Haigh, et al H.N. & W.S. SKERRETT Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88300787.4 | 29.01.1988 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | US19870010830 | 04.02.1987 Original published format: US 10830 | [1988/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0277782 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0277782 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B66F17/00, B66F9/075, B66F9/08 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
B66F17/003 (EP,US);
B66F9/0755 (EP,US);
B66F9/08 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18688 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/32] | Title | German: | Hebemast für eine Last, besonders geeignet für fahrerlose Fahrzeuge | [1988/32] | English: | Load-lifting mast especially adapted for use with automatically-guided vehicles | [1988/32] | French: | Mât de levage d'une charge adapté en particulier pour véhicule filoguidé | [1988/32] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/11] | 28.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3224529 (GANDOLFO PETER F); | [A]CH444038 (DEMAG ZUG GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE2530385 (HAUSHAHN C); | [A]GB2054148 (CROWN CONTROLS CORP); | [AD]US4411582 (NAKADA SHOICHI [JP]); | [AD]US4499971 (LUEBRECHT DONALD [US], et al); | [A]EP0158456 (CLARK EQUIPMENT CO [US]) |