EP0282310 - High power extended arc plasma spray method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Browning, James A. P.O. Box 6 Hanover New Hampshire 03755 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states Browning, James A. P.O. Box 6 Hanover New Hampshire 03755 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88302103.2 | 10.03.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | US19870024485 | 11.03.1987 Original published format: US 24485 | [1988/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0282310 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0282310 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282310 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/22 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
B05B7/226 (EP,US);
B05B7/224 (EP,US);
C23C4/134 (EP,US);
H05H1/3405 (EP,US);
H05H1/3468 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zum Hochleistungsplasmaspritzen | [1988/37] | English: | High power extended arc plasma spray method and apparatus | [1988/37] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour pulvérisation de plasma de grande puissance | [1988/37] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 08.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Request for further processing for: | 25.05.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 24.04.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.06.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3914573 (MUEHLBERGER ERICH); | [X]US3823302 (MUEHLBERGER E); | [Y]US4370538 (BROWNING JAMES A); | [A]US3197605 (FRANCOIS SUNNEN JEAN ALBERT); | [A]US3254970 (DITTRICH FERDINAND J, et al); | [A]FR2388776 (SHERRITT GORDON MINES LTD [CA]) |