EP0292153 - Polyphenylene ether resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakashita, Takeshi 1-40, Oogi-cho 3-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi / JP | 02 /
Itoi, Hideyuki 74-106, Oono-cho Saeki-gun Hiroshima / JP | 03 /
Hirose, Toshiyuki 3-5, Misono 1-chome Ootake-shi Hiroshima / JP | [1988/47] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1988/47] | Application number, filing date | 88304071.9 | 05.05.1988 | [1988/47] | Priority number, date | JP19870112701 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11270187 | JP19870112702 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11270287 | JP19870112703 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11270387 | JP19870112704 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11270487 | JP19870112705 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11270587 | JP19870112706 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11270687 | JP19870112707 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11270787 | JP19870112708 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11270887 | JP19870112709 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11270987 | JP19870112710 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11271087 | JP19870112711 | 09.05.1987 Original published format: JP 11271187 | [1988/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0292153 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0292153 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/04, C08L23/00, C08L51/00 | [1988/47] | CPC: |
C08L23/02 (EP);
C08L51/00 (EP);
C08L53/00 (EP);
C08L71/12 (EP,KR);
C08L63/00 (EP);
C08L67/00 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/02, C08L2666/22 (EP);
C08L51/00, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L71/12, C08L2666/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/47] | Title | German: | Polyphenylenetherharzzusammensetzung | [1988/47] | English: | Polyphenylene ether resin composition | [1988/47] | French: | Composition de résine de poly(éther de phénylène) | [1988/47] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/39] | 05.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3300232 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) |