EP0291232 - Surface immobilization of plant cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canadian Patents and Development Limited Société Canadienne des Brevets et d'Exploitation Limitée 275 Slater Street Ottawa Ontario, K1A 0R3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states Canadian Patents and Development Limited Société Canadienne des Brevets et d'Exploitation Limitée 275 Slater Street Ottawa Ontario, K1A 0R3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Archambault, Jean 207 Braebrook Street Pointe Claire Quebec, H9R 1V6 / CA | 02 /
Volesky, Bohumil 471 Berkley Avenue St. Laurent Quebec, J4P 3E7 / CA | 03 /
Kurz, Wolfgang G.W. 514 Copland Crescent Saskatoon Saskatchewan, S7H 2Z5 / CA | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1988/46] | Application number, filing date | 88304077.6 | 05.05.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | CA19870537315 | 15.05.1987 Original published format: CA 537315 | [1988/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0291232 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12N11/08, C12N11/12, C12N5/00, C12N5/02, C12M1/40, C12M3/00 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
C12N5/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Oberflächenimmobilisierung von Pflanzenzellen | [1988/46] | English: | Surface immobilization of plant cells | [1988/46] | French: | Immobilisation de cellules de plantes sur une surface | [1988/46] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 09.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 04.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/25] | 16.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2180554 [ ]; | WO8605811 [ ]; | EP0197784 [ ] |