EP0297791 - Valve operation control device for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otobe, Yutaka 1-6-13, Tate Shiki-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Kishi, Noriyuki 3-9-2, Azusawa Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | Piesold, Alexander J., et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1989/01] | Leale, Robin George FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88305769.7 | 24.06.1988 | [1989/01] | Priority number, date | JP19870158491 | 25.06.1987 Original published format: JP 15849187 | [1989/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0297791 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0297791 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F01L31/22, F01L13/00, F01L1/26 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
F01L1/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/01] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung des Ventilbetriebs in einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1989/01] | English: | Valve operation control device for internal combustion engine | [1989/01] | French: | Dispositif de commande des fonctionnement des soupapes d'un moteur à combustion interne | [1989/01] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 23.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Request for further processing for: | 08.11.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4535732 (NAKANO YOSHIKATSU [JP], et al); | [A]EP0213759 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0265281 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |