EP0311248 - Rotary engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/15] | High efficiency rotary steam engine | ||
[1992/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edling, Jack V. 2116 Camino Drive Escondido California 92026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states Edling, Jack V. 2116 Camino Drive Escondido California 92026 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308038.4 | 31.08.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | US19870104401 | 05.10.1987 Original published format: US 104401 | [1989/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311248 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311248 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311248 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/356 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
F01C1/3568 (EP,US);
F01C1/00 (KR);
F01B17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/15] | Title | German: | Rotationsmaschine | [1992/19] | English: | Rotary engine | [1992/19] | French: | Machine rotative | [1992/19] |
Former [1989/15] | Rotationsdampfmaschine hohen Wirkungsgrades | ||
Former [1989/15] | High efficiency rotary steam engine | ||
Former [1989/15] | Machine à vapeur rotative à haute efficacité | Examination procedure | 17.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 23.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.1992 | BE | 06.05.1992 | CH | 06.05.1992 | ES | 06.05.1992 | GR | 06.05.1992 | IT | 06.05.1992 | LI | 06.05.1992 | NL | 06.05.1992 | SE | 06.05.1992 | LU | 31.08.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 06.05.1992 | |
BE | 06.05.1992 | ||
CH | 06.05.1992 | ||
GR | 06.05.1992 | ||
IT | 06.05.1992 | ||
LI | 06.05.1992 | ||
NL | 06.05.1992 | ||
SE | 06.05.1992 | ||
LU | 31.08.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 06.05.1992 | |
BE | 06.05.1992 | ||
CH | 06.05.1992 | ||
IT | 06.05.1992 | ||
LI | 06.05.1992 | ||
NL | 06.05.1992 | ||
SE | 06.05.1992 | ||
LU | 31.08.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 06.05.1992 | |
BE | 06.05.1992 | ||
CH | 06.05.1992 | ||
IT | 06.05.1992 | ||
LI | 06.05.1992 | ||
NL | 06.05.1992 | ||
SE | 06.05.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | AT | 06.05.1992 | |
BE | 06.05.1992 | ||
CH | 06.05.1992 | ||
LI | 06.05.1992 | ||
NL | 06.05.1992 | ||
SE | 06.05.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 06.05.1992 | |
CH | 06.05.1992 | ||
LI | 06.05.1992 | ||
NL | 06.05.1992 | ||
SE | 06.05.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | CH | 06.05.1992 | |
LI | 06.05.1992 | ||
NL | 06.05.1992 | ||
SE | 06.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/52] | CH | 06.05.1992 | |
LI | 06.05.1992 | ||
SE | 06.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/49] | CH | 06.05.1992 | |
LI | 06.05.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE138757 ; | [AD]US605564 ; | [A]GB191126583 (LEWIS THEODORE HARDING [CA]); | [A]US1771351 (REID CHARLES R); | [A]US2498971 (WARNER FLOYD F, et al); | [A]FR2380444 (SIVAK JOZEF [FR]) |