|
25.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2000 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2000 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2000 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2000 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2000 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
18 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.06.1999 |
Description |
Opposition |
15 |
|
26.06.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.1999 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.01.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
13.01.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.1998 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.03.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.02.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
22.08.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.1995 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1994 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.10.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1994 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1994 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.03.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.02.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.10.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
14.07.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.07.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.07.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1993 |
Request for written evidence |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.1992 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1992 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
27.11.1991 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.08.1991 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.1991 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.1989 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1989 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
15.12.1988 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
15.12.1988 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1988 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1988 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
15.12.1988 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |