EP0323187 - Superconductive magneto-resistive device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kataoka, Shoei 3-20-16, Shibakubo-cho Tanashi-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nojima, Hideo 65-10, Minaminagai-cho Nara-shi Nara / JP | 03 /
Tsuchimoto, Shuhei 3-9-8, Taishi Ooji-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun Nara / JP | 04 /
Kita, Ryusuke 90-7, Kainozuka-cho Nara-shi Nara- / JP | 05 /
Saitoh, Susumu 2-538-7, Asakuradai Higashi Saurai-shi Nara / JP | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88312296.2 | 23.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | JP19870331008 | 25.12.1987 Original published format: JP 33100887 | JP19870333970 | 29.12.1987 Original published format: JP 33397087 | JP19880021610 | 01.02.1988 Original published format: JP 2161088 | JP19880066664 | 18.03.1988 Original published format: JP 6666488 | JP19880082448 | 04.04.1988 Original published format: JP 8244888 | JP19880117472 | 13.05.1988 Original published format: JP 11747288 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323187 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323187 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323187 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/035 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
G01R33/0352 (EP,US);
Y10S505/845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/27] | Title | German: | Supraleitendes Magnetwiderstandsgerät | [1989/27] | English: | Superconductive magneto-resistive device | [1989/27] | French: | Dispositif magnétorésistif à supra-conductivité | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 13.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Request for further processing for: | 03.07.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 03.07.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.07.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3426785 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4197987 (LAZZARI JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) | [Y] - INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING, Washington, D.C., 6th-9th December 1987, pages 867-868, IEEE, New York, US; S. TSUSCHIMOTO et al.: "Novel magnetic sensor using Y-Ba-Cu-O ceramic superconductor: super magneto-resistor" | [AD] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, part 1, vol. 27, no. 5, May 1988, pages 746-750, Tokyo, JP; H. NOJIMA et al.: "Galvanomagnetic effect or an Y-Ba-Cu-O ceramic superconductor and its application to magnetic sensors" | Examination | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 18, No. 8, January 1976, pp. 2745-2448, C.H. Bajorek: "Magneto resistive current sensor" |