EP0282402 - Methods and apparatus for safely measuring downhole conditions and formation characteristics while drilling a borehole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
GB
NL
Schlumberger Limited 277 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10172 / US | For:FR
IT
SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ELECTRIQUE SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For:DE
GB
NL
SCHLUMBERGER LIMITED 277 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10172 / US | ||
For:FR
IT
SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ELECTRIQUE SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wraight, Peter 3030 Bonney Briar Drive Missouri City Texas 77459 / US | 02 /
Marienbach, Edouard 3611 Glen Haven Houston Texas 77025 / US | 03 /
Hache, Jean-Michel 2842 River Birch Drive Sugar Land Texas 77478 / US | 04 /
Evans, Mike 3111 Meadowview Missouri City Texas 77459 / US | 05 /
Rhein-Knudsen, Erik 3222 Greenridge Missouri City Texas 77459 / US | [1988/37] | Representative(s) | Hagel, Francis Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | Hagel, Francis Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202 F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400497.9 | 03.03.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | US19870025319 | 13.03.1987 Original published format: US 25319 | [1988/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0282402 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0282402 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282402 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/00, E21B17/10, E21B23/03, G01V5/04 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
E21B17/1078 (EP,US);
E21B23/03 (EP,US);
E21B47/017 (EP,US);
G01V5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur ungefährdeten Messung von Bohrlochbedingungen und Formationseigenschaften während des Bohrens eines Bohrlochs | [1988/37] | English: | Methods and apparatus for safely measuring downhole conditions and formation characteristics while drilling a borehole | [1988/37] | French: | Procédés et dispositif pour mesurer en sécurité les conditions de fond de trou et les caractéristiques de formation en cours de forage d'un puits | [1988/37] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 11.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3255353 (SCHERBATSKOY SERGE A); | [A]EP0160351 (HALLIBURTON CO [US]); | [AD]US4596926 (COOPE DANIEL F [US]); | [A]US4605065 (ABERCROMBIE BOLLING A [US]) |