EP0307276 - Sampling filter device with switched capacitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states ETAT FRANCAIS représenté par le Ministre Délégué des Postes et Télécommunications (CENTRE NATIONAL D'ETUDES DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS) 38-40 rue du Général Leclerc F-92131 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tawfik, Mohamed Sameh 150, Galerie de l'Arlequin F-38100 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Senn, Patrice 13, Grande Rue F-38000 Grenoble / FR | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Netter, André, et al Cabinet NETTER, 40, rue Vignon 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | Netter, André, et al Cabinet NETTER, 40, rue Vignon F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402152.8 | 24.08.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | FR19870011961 | 26.08.1987 Original published format: FR 8711961 | [1989/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0307276 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307276 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03H19/00 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
H03H19/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/11] | Title | German: | Bemusterte Filtereinrichtung mit geschalteten Kapazitäten | [1989/11] | English: | Sampling filter device with switched capacitors | [1989/11] | French: | Dispositif de filtre échantillonné à capacités commutées | [1989/11] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 18.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 21, no. 2, 17 janvier 1985, pages 79-80, Stevenage, Herts, GB; H. BAHER: "Synthesis of highpass switched-capacitor LDI filters" | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 21, no. 11, 23 mai 1985, pages 484-485, Stevenage, Herts, GB; S. ERIKSSON: "SC filter circuit with decimation of sampling frequency" | [A] - FREQUENZ, vol. 35, no. 3/4, mars-avril 1981, pages 93-95, Berlin, DE; P. LUTZ: "Real terminations of SC-filters using LDI-integrators | [AP] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, vol. 75, no. 7, juillet 1987, pages 957-960, New York, US; P.V. ANANDA MOHAN: "New structures for MOSFET-C filters" |